Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB234 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill December 9, 2014

House Committee Report

Witness List February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Engrossed

Bill May 11, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 1, 2025
Analysis February 1, 2025
Fiscal Note February 1, 2025
Bill February 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015