E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 1/1/16
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3647
|
E
|
05/27/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2413
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2660
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2237
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1805
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3920
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1238
|
Journal Page: 3919
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3919
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3919
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1228
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2443
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2443
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1038
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1038
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1038
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1038
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1037
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1037
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1037
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 950
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 927
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 90
|
Senate
|
01/26/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 90
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/10/2014
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|