LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB24
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB24
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB24
Compare Versions
SB24 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB24 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB24 Enrolled May 26, 2015
SB24 Comm Sub May 15, 2015
SB24 Engrossed April 22, 2015
SB24 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
SB24 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 1 (Old)
SB24 House Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB24 Senate Committee Report February 1, 2025
SB24 Enrolled May 26, 2015
SB24 Comm Sub May 15, 2015
SB24 Engrossed April 22, 2015
SB24 Comm Sub April 15, 2015
SB24 Introduced November 10, 2014
Version 2 (New)
Compare