House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2443 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2443 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1844 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1094 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1044 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1044 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1044 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1044 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1044 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1044 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1043 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Zaffirini | Journal Page: 1043 |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1043 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1043 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1054 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 90 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 90 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |