House | 05/05/2015 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/21/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1029 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 995 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 995 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 995 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 995 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 994 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 994 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 994 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA9 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 993 |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 993 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 983 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 983 | |
Senate | 04/20/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 998 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 815 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 571 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 550 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Testimony taken in subcommittee | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 382 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 369 | |
Senate | 03/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 357 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Referred to s/c on Border Security by Pres | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |