Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB335 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Taylor of Collin S.B. No. 335
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2015; February 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 9, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 9, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 335 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the right of officers of counties, county boards of
 school trustees, and county boards of education to obtain
 information, documents, and records.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 89, Local Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 89.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 89.007.  SPECIAL RIGHT OF ACCESS TO INFORMATION BY
 OFFICERS OF COUNTIES, COUNTY BOARDS OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES, AND COUNTY
 BOARDS OF EDUCATION. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "County governmental body":
 (A)  means:
 (i)  a county commissioners court;
 (ii)  a deliberative body that has
 rulemaking or quasi-judicial power and that is classified as a
 department, agency, or political subdivision of a county;
 (iii)  a county board of school trustees;
 (iv)  a county board of education; or
 (v)  the part, section, or portion of a
 county, county board of school trustees, or county board of
 education described by Section 552.003(1)(A)(xii), Government
 Code, that is a governmental body for purposes of Chapter 552,
 Government Code; and
 (B)  does not include:
 (i)  the judiciary; or
 (ii)  a private entity that spends or is
 supported wholly or partly by public funds.
 (2)  "County officer" means:
 (A)  an elected or appointed officer who
 supervises, manages, or controls a county governmental body; or
 (B)  a member of a board, a commission, a
 committee, or another body consisting of more than one individual
 elected or appointed to supervise, manage, or control a county
 governmental body.
 (3)  "Public information" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 552.002, Government Code.
 (b)  A county officer has a right of access to information
 that is for purposes of Chapter 552, Government Code, public
 information of the county governmental body that the county officer
 oversees.
 (c)  A county governmental body on request by the county
 officer who oversees the governmental body shall provide public
 information, including confidential information or information
 otherwise excepted from disclosure, to the county officer in
 accordance with Chapter 552, Government Code.
 (d)  A county governmental body, by providing public
 information under this section that is confidential or otherwise
 excepted from required disclosure under law, does not waive or
 affect the confidentiality of the information for purposes of state
 or federal law or waive the right of the county governmental body to
 assert exceptions to required disclosure of the information in the
 future. The county governmental body may require the requesting
 county officer or a designated employee of the requesting county
 officer who will view or handle information that is received under
 this section and that is confidential under law or otherwise
 excepted from disclosure to sign a confidentiality agreement that
 covers the information and requires that:
 (1)  the information not be disclosed outside the
 office of the requesting county officer, or within that office for
 purposes other than the purpose for which it was received;
 (2)  the information be labeled as confidential;
 (3)  the information be kept securely; or
 (4)  the number of copies made of the information or the
 notes taken from the information that implicate the confidential
 nature of the information be controlled, with all copies or notes
 that are not destroyed or returned to the county governmental body
 remaining confidential and subject to the confidentiality
 agreement.
 (e)  An individual required by a county governmental body to
 sign a confidentiality agreement under Subsection (d) may seek a
 decision as provided by Subsection (f) about whether the
 information covered by the confidentiality agreement is
 confidential under law or otherwise excepted from disclosure.  A
 confidentiality agreement signed under Subsection (d) is void to
 the extent that the agreement covers information that is finally
 determined under Subsection (f) to not be confidential under law or
 otherwise excepted from disclosure.
 (f)  A county officer may seek a decision from the attorney
 general about whether the information covered by the
 confidentiality agreement is confidential under law or otherwise
 excepted from disclosure.  The attorney general by rule shall
 establish procedures and deadlines for receiving information
 necessary to determine whether the information covered by the
 confidentiality agreement is confidential under law or otherwise
 excepted from disclosure and for receiving briefs from the
 requesting county officer, the county governmental body, and any
 other interested person.  The attorney general shall promptly
 render a decision requested under this subsection, determining
 whether the information covered by the confidentiality agreement is
 confidential under law or otherwise excepted from disclosure, not
 later than the 45th business day after the date the attorney general
 receives the request for a decision under this subsection.  If the
 attorney general is unable to issue the decision within the 45-day
 period, the attorney general may extend the period for issuing the
 decision by an additional 10 business days by informing the county
 governmental body and the requesting county officer, during the
 original 45-day period, of the reason for the delay. The attorney
 general shall issue a written decision and provide a copy of the
 decision to the requesting county officer, the county governmental
 body, and any interested person who submitted necessary information
 or a brief to the attorney general under this subsection.  The
 requesting county officer or the county governmental body may
 appeal a decision of the attorney general under this subsection to a
 district court in the county.  A person may appeal a decision of the
 attorney general under this subsection to a district court in the
 county if the person claims a proprietary interest in the
 information affected by the decision or a privacy interest in the
 information that a confidentiality law or judicial decision is
 designed to protect.
 (g)  This section does not affect:
 (1)  the right of a county officer to obtain
 information from a county governmental body under other law;
 (2)  the procedures under which the information is
 obtained under other law; or
 (3)  the use that may be made of the information
 obtained under other law.
 (h)  This section does not grant authority to a county
 governmental body to withhold information from county officers.
 SECTION 2.  Section 89.007, Local Government Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to a request for information by a county
 officer that is made on or after the effective date of this Act.  A
 request for information made before the effective date of this Act
 is governed by the applicable law in effect immediately before the
 effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *