House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2260 | |
House | 04/16/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Remarks ordered printed | Journal Page: 939 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 939 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 939 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 939 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 939 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 938 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 938 | |
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 938 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 760 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 161 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 161 | |
Senate | 01/23/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |