House | 05/07/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2810 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1492 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 502 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 162 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 162 | |
Senate | 01/23/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/23/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |