Senate | 03/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 344 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 295 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 162 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 162 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |