Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB378 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Analysis February 2, 2025
Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill January 28, 2015

House Committee Report

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Engrossed

Fiscal Note February 2, 2025
Bill March 31, 2015

Senate Committee Report

Witness List February 2, 2025
Bill February 2, 2025

Enrolled

Analysis February 2, 2025
Bill May 4, 2015

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2015
Bill March 25, 2015