E | 05/23/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/23/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2026 | |
E | 05/14/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1613 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3545 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1593 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1613 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1566 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3277 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Record vote | RV#990 | Journal Page: 3277 |
House | 05/13/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3277 | |
House | 05/13/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3277 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3199 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3198 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1340 | Journal Page: 3198 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2965 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 03/31/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1338 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 626 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 626 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 626 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 626 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 626 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 626 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 626 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 500 | |
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 165 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 165 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |