House | 05/22/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/21/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4218 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/20/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 03/31/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1339 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 672 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 651 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 650 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/19/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 166 | |
Senate | 02/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 166 | |
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |