House
|
05/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 936
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 166
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 166
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|