Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB398 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/16/2015

                    By: Schwertner, Huffines S.B. No. 398
 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2015; February 2, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 16, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 1; March 16, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to fingerprints collected by the Texas Department of
 Public Safety from an applicant for a driver's license or personal
 identification certificate and used for the department's image
 verification system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.059(a), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The department shall establish an image verification
 system based on the following identifiers collected by the
 department under Section 521.142(b):
 (1)  an applicant's facial image; and
 (2)  an applicant's thumbprints or, if thumbprints
 cannot be taken, the index fingerprints of the applicant.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *