House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1844
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1094
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1053
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 192
|
Senate
|
02/09/2015
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 192
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 184
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 184
|
Senate
|
01/30/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|