By: Whitmire S.B. No. 418 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2015; February 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs; February 9, 2015, rereferred to Committee on Criminal Justice; April 20, 2015, reported favorably, as amended, by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 20, 2015, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By: Whitmire Amend SB 418 (Introduced) as follows: In section 1 of the bill, page 1, line 27 strike the word made. Strike section 2 of the bill, page 32 thru page 38. A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to requests by the State Commission on Judicial Conduct for certain records held by court reporters. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 33.030, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: (c) If an official court reporter has made a backup audio media recording of a court proceeding, the court reporter on request of the commission shall produce to the commission at no cost to the commission a true and correct copy of the backup audio media recording. SECTION 2. Section 52.046, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsection (e) to read as follows: (e) An official court reporter who does not comply with a request to produce a copy of a backup audio media recording under Section 33.030 is considered to have committed a wilful or negligent violation or failure of duty for purposes of Section 154.110. SECTION 3. Section 52.046, Government Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to conduct that occurs on or after the effective date of this Act. Conduct that occurs before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the conduct occurred, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 15, 2015. * * * * *