E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3103
|
E
|
05/20/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1787
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3787
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1537
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#966
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3180
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3072
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3072
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Amended
|
1-G. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 3071
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3071
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 3475
|
Journal Page: 3071
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2108
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1630
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1002
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Schwertner
|
Journal Page: 938
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 937
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 950
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 451
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 184
|
Senate
|
02/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 184
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|