LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB425
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB425
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB425
Compare Versions
SB425 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB425 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB425 Enrolled May 18, 2015
SB425 Comm Sub May 6, 2015
SB425 Engrossed April 16, 2015
SB425 Comm Sub April 13, 2015
SB425 Introduced February 2, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB425 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB425 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB425 Enrolled May 18, 2015
SB425 Comm Sub May 6, 2015
SB425 Engrossed April 16, 2015
SB425 Comm Sub April 13, 2015
SB425 Introduced February 2, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare