E | 05/22/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/22/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1947 | |
E | 05/12/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1547 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3262 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1537 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1547 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1469 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Record vote | RV#758 | Journal Page: 2841 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2841 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2841 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2826 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2826 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 439 | Journal Page: 2826 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2676 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2437 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2261 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1497 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 789 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Garcia | Journal Page: 745 |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 744 | |
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 190 | |
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |