Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB449 Senate Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   C.S.S.B. 449     84R17433 AAF-D   By: Bettencourt         Transportation         4/2/2015         Committee Report (Substituted)    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 449
84R17433 AAF-D By: Bettencourt
 Transportation
 4/2/2015
 Committee Report (Substituted)

Senate Research Center

C.S.S.B. 449

84R17433 AAF-D

By: Bettencourt

 

Transportation

 

4/2/2015

 

Committee Report (Substituted)

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   The popularity of three-wheeled motorcycles is growing in Texas and manufacturers are developing numerous models of these "trikes."   On July 11, 2014, Polaris received approval from the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles to add their new Slingshot model to their existing line of motorcycles they are authorized to sell.   Subsequently, on November 14, 2014, the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles informed Polaris they could not define the Slingshot as a motorcycle because it does not have a "rider's saddle" seat and Polaris could not sell them in Texas.   Polaris dealers across the state now have Slingshot models in their inventory that they are unable to sell because of the reversal of original authorization.   S.B. 449 allows three-wheeled vehicles with seats other than a "rider's saddle" to be classified as a motorcycle.    (Original Authors/Sponsors Statement of Intent)   C.S.S.B. 449 amends current law relating to titling and registration of an autocycle.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.    SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter A, Chapter 501, Transportation Code, by adding Section 501.008, as follows;   Sec. 501.008. TITLE FOR AUTOCYCLE. (a) Defines, in this section, "autocycle" to mean a motor vehicle, other than a tractor, that is:   (1) designed to have when propelled not more than three wheels on the ground;   (2) equipped with a steering wheel;   (3) equipped with seating that does not require the operator to straddle or sit astride the seat; and   (4) manufactured and certified to comply with federal safety requirements for a motorcycle.   (b) Provides that, for purposes of issuing a title under this chapter, an autocycle is considered to be a motorcycle.   SECTION 2. Amends Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code, by adding Section 502.004, as follows:   Sec. 502.004. REGISTRATION OF AUTOCYCLE. (a) Makes conforming changes regarding the definition of "autocycle."   (b) Provides that, for purposes of issuing a title under this chapter, an autocycle is considered to be a motorcycle.   SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2015.  

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

The popularity of three-wheeled motorcycles is growing in Texas and manufacturers are developing numerous models of these "trikes."

 

On July 11, 2014, Polaris received approval from the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles to add their new Slingshot model to their existing line of motorcycles they are authorized to sell.

 

Subsequently, on November 14, 2014, the Texas Department of Motor Vehicles informed Polaris they could not define the Slingshot as a motorcycle because it does not have a "rider's saddle" seat and Polaris could not sell them in Texas.

 

Polaris dealers across the state now have Slingshot models in their inventory that they are unable to sell because of the reversal of original authorization.

 

S.B. 449 allows three-wheeled vehicles with seats other than a "rider's saddle" to be classified as a motorcycle. 

 

(Original Authors/Sponsors Statement of Intent)

 

C.S.S.B. 449 amends current law relating to titling and registration of an autocycle.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency. 

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter A, Chapter 501, Transportation Code, by adding Section 501.008, as follows;

 

Sec. 501.008. TITLE FOR AUTOCYCLE. (a) Defines, in this section, "autocycle" to mean a motor vehicle, other than a tractor, that is:

 

(1) designed to have when propelled not more than three wheels on the ground;

 

(2) equipped with a steering wheel;

 

(3) equipped with seating that does not require the operator to straddle or sit astride the seat; and

 

(4) manufactured and certified to comply with federal safety requirements for a motorcycle.

 

(b) Provides that, for purposes of issuing a title under this chapter, an autocycle is considered to be a motorcycle.

 

SECTION 2. Amends Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code, by adding Section 502.004, as follows:

 

Sec. 502.004. REGISTRATION OF AUTOCYCLE. (a) Makes conforming changes regarding the definition of "autocycle."

 

(b) Provides that, for purposes of issuing a title under this chapter, an autocycle is considered to be a motorcycle.

 

SECTION 3. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2015.