Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB449 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2015

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 449
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2015; February 9, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 7, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 7, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 449 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to titling and registration of an autocycle.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 501, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 501.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 501.008.  TITLE FOR AUTOCYCLE. (a)  In this section,
 "autocycle" means a motor vehicle, other than a tractor, that is:
 (1)  designed to have when propelled not more than
 three wheels on the ground;
 (2)  equipped with a steering wheel;
 (3)  equipped with seating that does not require the
 operator to straddle or sit astride the seat; and
 (4)  manufactured and certified to comply with federal
 safety requirements for a motorcycle.
 (b)  For purposes of issuing a title under this chapter, an
 autocycle is considered to be a motorcycle.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 502, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 502.004 to read as follows:
 Sec. 502.004.  REGISTRATION OF AUTOCYCLE. (a)  In this
 section, "autocycle" means a motor vehicle, other than a tractor,
 that is:
 (1)  designed to have when propelled not more than
 three wheels on the ground;
 (2)  equipped with a steering wheel;
 (3)  equipped with seating that does not require the
 operator to straddle or sit astride the seat; and
 (4)  manufactured and certified to comply with federal
 safety requirements for a motorcycle.
 (b)  For purposes of registering a vehicle under this
 chapter, an autocycle is considered to be a motorcycle.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *