Senate | 03/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 344 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 313 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 252 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |