1 | 1 | | By: Seliger, Perry S.B. No. 488 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed February 9, 2015; February 10, 2015, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and |
---|
4 | 4 | | Military Installations; March 2, 2015, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 2, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to the criteria for awarding the Texas Purple Heart Medal |
---|
12 | 12 | | to members of the armed forces wounded or killed at Fort Hood on |
---|
13 | 13 | | November 5, 2009. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 437.355(a), Government Code, is amended |
---|
16 | 16 | | to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (a) The governor or adjutant general, if delegated the |
---|
18 | 18 | | authority, may adopt policies and regulations relating to awarding: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be |
---|
20 | 20 | | awarded to a service member who: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (A) [,] after September 11, 2001: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (i) [(A)] was inducted into federal service |
---|
23 | 23 | | from the Texas National Guard; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | (ii) [(B)] meets the criteria for an award |
---|
25 | 25 | | of the federal Purple Heart Medal; or |
---|
26 | 26 | | (B) was wounded or killed at Fort Hood on |
---|
27 | 27 | | November 5, 2009; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be |
---|
29 | 29 | | awarded to: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (A) a service member of the Texas military forces |
---|
31 | 31 | | who has: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable |
---|
33 | 33 | | state service or a combination of state and federal service; and |
---|
34 | 34 | | (ii) continually demonstrated superior |
---|
35 | 35 | | performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions |
---|
36 | 36 | | demanding responsibility; or |
---|
37 | 37 | | (B) a civilian who has contributed significant |
---|
38 | 38 | | service to the Texas military forces; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (3) the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which |
---|
40 | 40 | | shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state, |
---|
41 | 41 | | another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding |
---|
42 | 42 | | achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of |
---|
43 | 43 | | great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces |
---|
44 | 44 | | for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for |
---|
45 | 45 | | award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that: |
---|
46 | 46 | | (A) gives an account of the exceptional |
---|
47 | 47 | | achievement or service; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (B) includes facts and photographs, and extracts |
---|
49 | 49 | | from official documents to support and amplify the facts; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (4) the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall |
---|
51 | 51 | | be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state, |
---|
52 | 52 | | another state, or the United States who has performed service in a |
---|
53 | 53 | | superior and clearly outstanding manner; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (5) the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall |
---|
55 | 55 | | be awarded to a service member who: |
---|
56 | 56 | | (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the |
---|
57 | 57 | | federal Humanitarian Service Medal; |
---|
58 | 58 | | (B) is a member of the Texas military forces; and |
---|
59 | 59 | | (C) while serving on state active duty or active |
---|
60 | 60 | | duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United |
---|
61 | 61 | | States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a |
---|
62 | 62 | | mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during |
---|
63 | 63 | | or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state; |
---|
64 | 64 | | (6) the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which |
---|
65 | 65 | | shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces |
---|
66 | 66 | | who served: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (A) on or after September 11, 2001; |
---|
68 | 68 | | (B) on state active duty or active duty under |
---|
69 | 69 | | state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code; |
---|
70 | 70 | | and |
---|
71 | 71 | | (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a |
---|
72 | 72 | | mission in the state under civilian authority; |
---|
73 | 73 | | (7) the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded |
---|
74 | 74 | | to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the |
---|
75 | 75 | | Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or |
---|
76 | 76 | | after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days; |
---|
77 | 77 | | (8) the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be |
---|
78 | 78 | | awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served, |
---|
79 | 79 | | after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by |
---|
80 | 80 | | the United States secretary of defense; |
---|
81 | 81 | | (9) the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be |
---|
82 | 82 | | awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed |
---|
83 | 83 | | five years of honorable service during which the service member has |
---|
84 | 84 | | shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to |
---|
85 | 85 | | this state; |
---|
86 | 86 | | (10) the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded |
---|
87 | 87 | | to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or |
---|
88 | 88 | | the United States who performs outstanding service or attains |
---|
89 | 89 | | extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States; |
---|
90 | 90 | | (11) the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall |
---|
91 | 91 | | be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive |
---|
92 | 92 | | years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the |
---|
93 | 93 | | service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and |
---|
94 | 94 | | great loyalty to this state; |
---|
95 | 95 | | (12) the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign |
---|
96 | 96 | | Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted |
---|
97 | 97 | | into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1, |
---|
98 | 98 | | 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert |
---|
99 | 99 | | Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was |
---|
100 | 100 | | deployed while serving on active federal military duty; |
---|
101 | 101 | | (13) the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be |
---|
102 | 102 | | awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service |
---|
103 | 103 | | from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the |
---|
104 | 104 | | service member was deployed while serving on active federal |
---|
105 | 105 | | military duty, after: |
---|
106 | 106 | | (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi |
---|
107 | 107 | | Freedom; or |
---|
108 | 108 | | (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New |
---|
109 | 109 | | Dawn; and |
---|
110 | 110 | | (14) the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall |
---|
111 | 111 | | be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service |
---|
112 | 112 | | from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of |
---|
113 | 113 | | Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the |
---|
114 | 114 | | service member was deployed while serving on active federal |
---|
115 | 115 | | military duty. |
---|
116 | 116 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
117 | 117 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
118 | 118 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
119 | 119 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
120 | 120 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
121 | 121 | | * * * * * |
---|