House | 04/15/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1578 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 636 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 614 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 358 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 337 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 337 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 337 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 337 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 West | Journal Page: 336 |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 336 | |
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 343 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 326 | |
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/02/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 313 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 284 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 267 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 251 | |
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 221 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 02/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 189 | |
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/04/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |