Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB5 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 By: Nichols, et al. S.B. No. 5
2- (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2015; February 9, 2015,
3- read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
4- March 2, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5- Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1; March 2, 2015,
6- sent to printer.)
7-Click here to see the committee vote
8- COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 5 By: Nichols
92
103
114 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
12- AN ACT
13- relating to the allocation of certain motor vehicle sales, use, and
14- rental tax revenue to the state highway fund and to the uses of that
15- revenue.
5+ relating to the allocation to the state highway fund and the
6+ available school fund of certain motor vehicle sales, use, and
7+ rental tax revenue and to the uses of the revenue allocated to the
8+ state highway fund.
169 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1710 SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 152, Tax Code, is amended
1811 by adding Section 152.1223 to read as follows:
1912 Sec. 152.1223. ALLOCATION OF CERTAIN TAX REVENUE TO STATE
2013 HIGHWAY FUND. (a) This section applies only to money that:
2114 (1) the comptroller receives in a state fiscal year
2215 that begins on or after September 1, 2017;
2316 (2) is received under Sections 152.043, 152.045,
2417 152.047, and 152.121, is derived from the taxes imposed under
2518 Sections 152.021, 152.022, 152.023, 152.026, and 152.028, and is
2619 remaining after the comptroller makes the allocation required by
2720 Section 152.1222; and
2821 (3) exceeds the first $2.5 billion of the money
2922 described by Subdivisions (1) and (2) that is received in that state
3023 fiscal year.
3124 (b) Notwithstanding Section 152.122, the comptroller shall
3225 deposit the money to which this section applies as follows:
3326 (1) the comptroller shall deposit all money received
3427 to the credit of the state highway fund until a total of $2.5
3528 billion has been deposited to the fund under this subdivision in the
3629 state fiscal year; and
3730 (2) the comptroller shall deposit any additional money
3831 received in the state fiscal year as follows:
39- (A) one-half to the credit of the state highway
40- fund; and
41- (B) the remainder to the credit of the general
42- revenue fund.
32+ (A) fifty percent to the credit of the state
33+ highway fund;
34+ (B) thirty percent to the credit of the general
35+ revenue fund; and
36+ (C) twenty percent to the credit of the available
37+ school fund.
4338 (c) Money deposited to the credit of the state highway fund
4439 under this section may be appropriated only to:
4540 (1) construct, maintain, or acquire rights-of-way for
4641 public roadways other than toll roads; or
4742 (2) repay the principal of and interest on general
4843 obligation bonds issued as authorized by Section 49-p, Article III,
4944 Texas Constitution.
5045 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
51- * * * * *