Senate | 03/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 572 | |
Senate | 03/18/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/16/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 421 | |
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 246 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 246 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |