Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB527 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Birdwell, Perry S.B. No. 527
 (In the Senate - Filed February 10, 2015; February 18, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 16, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 16, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 527 By:  Huffines


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a segment of U.S. Highway 287 in
 Midlothian as the Chris Kyle and Chad Littlefield Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.102 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.102.  CHRIS KYLE AND CHAD LITTLEFIELD MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a)  Notwithstanding Section 225.001(c), the portion of
 U.S. Highway 287 in Midlothian between its intersection with Rex
 Odom Drive and its intersection with Kimble Road is designated as
 the Chris Kyle and Chad Littlefield Memorial Highway.  The
 designation is in addition to any other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Chris Kyle and Chad Littlefield Memorial Highway
 and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *