House | 05/24/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/24/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4468 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/23/2015 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 4335 | |
House | 05/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 4335 | |
House | 05/22/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4215 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2026 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1877 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1877 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1877 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1877 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1809 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1809 | |
Senate | 05/21/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1808 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1676 | |
Senate | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1434 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1125 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 370 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 246 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 246 | |
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/10/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |