Senate | 05/04/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 02/16/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/16/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |