Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB589 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodríguez, Hinojosa S.B. No. 589
 (In the Senate - Filed February 16, 2015; February 23, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 7, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 2; April 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the award of diligent participation credit to
 defendants confined in a state jail felony facility.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 15(h)(5) and (6), Article 42.12, Code
 of Criminal Procedure, are amended to read as follows:
 (5)  For a defendant who has participated in an
 educational, vocational, treatment, or work program while confined
 in a state jail felony facility, [not later than the 30th day before
 the date on which the defendant will have served 80 percent of the
 defendant's sentence,] the Texas Department of Criminal Justice
 shall record [report to the sentencing court] the number of days
 during which the defendant diligently participated in any
 educational, vocational, treatment, or work program.  The
 department shall [The contents of a report submitted under this
 subdivision are not subject to challenge by a defendant.
 [(6)     A judge, based on the report received under
 Subdivision (5), may] credit against a defendant's sentence [any
 time a defendant is required to serve in a state jail felony
 facility] additional time for each day the defendant actually
 served in the facility while diligently participating in an
 educational, vocational, treatment, or work program.  A time credit
 under this subdivision may not exceed one-fifth of the defendant's
 original sentence [amount of time the defendant is originally
 required to serve in the facility].  A defendant may not be awarded
 a credit under this subdivision for any period during which the
 defendant is subject to disciplinary status [action].  A time
 credit under this subdivision is a privilege and not a right.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a person confined in a state jail felony facility for an offense
 committed on or after the effective date of this Act. A person
 confined in a state jail felony facility for an offense committed
 before the effective date of this Act is covered by the law in
 effect when the offense was committed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section,
 an offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if
 any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *