E
|
05/28/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/28/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3103
|
E
|
05/18/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3785
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1670
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1625
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1262
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#448
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1517
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/10/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 789
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 713
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 264
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 264
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|