House | 04/28/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/17/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 1705 | |
House | 04/17/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1705 | |
House | 03/31/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1339 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 672 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 649 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 635 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 635 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 635 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 635 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Menndez | Journal Page: 634 |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/30/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 634 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 571 | |
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 550 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 322 | |
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/03/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |