House | 05/18/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3787 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/29/2015 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 04/29/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2108 | |
House | 04/15/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1579 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 804 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 804 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 804 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 804 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 802 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/17/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |