House | 05/14/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3543 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3543 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2830 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Point of order | Journal Page: 1376 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Amendment tabled | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 1375 |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1375 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1390 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1202 | |
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 93 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 93 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |