Senate | 04/27/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1125 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1054 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1027 | |
Senate | 04/15/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 925 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 787 | |
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 757 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 266 | |
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |