E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3503
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3439
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5208
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2755
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1969
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1293
|
Journal Page: 4117
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4117
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4117
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 4105
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Burkett
|
Journal Page: 4105
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4105
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3990
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4088
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1338
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 630
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 630
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 630
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 629
|
Senate
|
03/30/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 502
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 267
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 267
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|