LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB631
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB631
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB631
Compare Versions
SB631 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB631 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB631 Enrolled May 28, 2015
SB631 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
SB631 Engrossed March 30, 2015
SB631 Comm Sub March 18, 2015
SB631 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB631 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB631 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB631 Enrolled May 28, 2015
SB631 Comm Sub May 20, 2015
SB631 Engrossed March 30, 2015
SB631 Comm Sub March 18, 2015
SB631 Introduced February 18, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare