Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB631 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 631


 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of certain contiguous municipalities to
 agree to extend municipal court jurisdiction.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 4.14(f), Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  A municipality with a population of 1.19 [1.9] million
 or more and another municipality contiguous to that municipality
 may enter into an agreement providing concurrent jurisdiction for
 the municipal courts of either jurisdiction for all criminal cases
 arising from offenses under state law that are:
 (1)  committed on the boundary of those municipalities
 or within 200 yards of that boundary; and
 (2)  punishable by fine only.
 SECTION 2.  Section 29.003(h), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (h)  A municipality with a population of 1.19 [1.9] million
 or more and another municipality contiguous to that municipality
 may enter into an agreement providing concurrent jurisdiction for
 the municipal courts of either jurisdiction for all criminal cases
 arising from offenses under state law that are:
 (1)  committed on the boundary of those municipalities
 or within 200 yards of that boundary; and
 (2)  punishable by fine only.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and
 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 631 passed the Senate on
 March 30, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 28, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 631 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 22, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 140,
 Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor