E
|
05/23/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
05/23/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2026
|
E
|
05/14/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3545
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1593
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3404
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1263
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#511
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2295
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2182
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#473
|
Journal Page: 2182
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2182
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Raney
|
Journal Page: 2181
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2181
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
CSHB 3442
|
Journal Page: 2181
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2112
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1596
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 953
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 918
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 917
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 917
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 917
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 917
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Schwertner
|
Journal Page: 916
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 916
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 916
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 280
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 280
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|