LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB641
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB641
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB641
Compare Versions
SB641 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB641 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB641 Enrolled May 13, 2015
SB641 Comm Sub April 29, 2015
SB641 Engrossed April 15, 2015
SB641 Comm Sub March 23, 2015
SB641 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB641 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB641 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB641 Enrolled May 13, 2015
SB641 Comm Sub April 29, 2015
SB641 Engrossed April 15, 2015
SB641 Comm Sub March 23, 2015
SB641 Introduced February 19, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare