Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB641 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 641
 (In the Senate - Filed February 19, 2015; February 24, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 23, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 23, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 641 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to debit card or stored value card surcharges; providing a
 civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 59.401, Finance Code, is amended by
 adding Subdivision (5) to read as follows:
 (5)  "Surcharge" means any increase in the price
 charged for goods or services imposed on a customer who pays with a
 debit or stored value card that is not imposed on a customer who
 pays by other means.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 59, Finance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 59.403 to read as follows:
 Sec. 59.403.  CIVIL PENALTY. (a)  A person who knowingly
 violates Section 59.402 is liable to the state for a civil penalty
 in an amount not to exceed $1,000 for each violation. The attorney
 general or the prosecuting attorney in the county in which the
 violation occurs may bring:
 (1)  a suit to recover the civil penalty imposed under
 this section; and
 (2)  an action in the name of the state to restrain or
 enjoin a person from violating this chapter.
 (b)  Before bringing the action, the attorney general or
 prosecuting attorney shall give the person notice of the person's
 noncompliance and liability for a civil penalty.  If the person
 complies with Section 59.402 not later than the 30th day after the
 date of the notice, the violation is cured and the person is not
 liable for the civil penalty.
 (c)  The attorney general or prosecuting attorney, as
 appropriate, is entitled to recover reasonable expenses incurred in
 obtaining injunctive relief, civil penalties, or both, under this
 section, including reasonable attorney's fees, court costs, and
 investigatory costs.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a sale of goods or services occurring on or after the effective date
 of this Act.  A sale of goods or services occurring before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the sale occurred, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *