Texas 2015 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB641 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 641


 AN ACT
 relating to debit card or stored value card surcharges; providing a
 civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 59, Finance Code, is
 transferred to Title 12, Business & Commerce Code, redesignated as
 Chapter 604A, Business & Commerce Code, and amended to read as
 follows:
 CHAPTER 604A [SUBCHAPTER E].  PROHIBITION OF CERTAIN SURCHARGES
 [SURCHARGE]
 Sec. 604A.001 [59.401].  DEFINITIONS.  In this chapter
 [subchapter]:
 (1)  "Cardholder" means the person named on the face of
 a debit or stored value card to whom or for whose benefit the card is
 issued.
 (2)  "Debit card" has the meaning assigned by [in]
 Section 502.001[, Business & Commerce Code].
 (3)  "Merchant" means a person in the business of
 selling or leasing goods or services.
 (4)  "Stored value card" has the meaning assigned by
 [as defined in] Section 604.001(1), [Business & Commerce Code,] but
 does not include the meaning assigned by [as defined in] Section
 604.001(2)[, Business & Commerce Code].
 (5)  "Surcharge" means an increase in the price charged
 for goods or services imposed on a buyer who pays with a debit or
 stored value card that is not imposed on a buyer who pays by other
 means.  The term does not include a discounted price charged for
 goods or services to a buyer who pays with cash.
 Sec. 604A.002 [59.402].  IMPOSITION OF SURCHARGE FOR USE OF
 DEBIT OR STORED VALUE CARD. (a)  In a sale of goods or services, a
 merchant may not impose a surcharge on a buyer who uses a debit or
 stored value card instead of cash, a check, credit card, or a
 similar means of payment.
 (b)  This section does not apply to a state agency, county,
 local governmental entity, or other governmental entity that
 accepts a debit or stored value card for the payment of fees, taxes,
 or other charges.
 Sec. 604A.003.  CIVIL PENALTY. (a)  A person who knowingly
 violates Section 604A.002 is liable to the state for a civil penalty
 in an amount not to exceed $500 for each violation. The attorney
 general or the prosecuting attorney in the county in which the
 violation occurs may bring:
 (1)  a suit to recover the civil penalty imposed under
 this section; and
 (2)  an action in the name of the state to restrain or
 enjoin a person from violating this chapter.
 (b)  Before bringing the action, the attorney general or
 prosecuting attorney shall give the person notice of the person's
 noncompliance and liability for a civil penalty. The notice must:
 (1)  contain guidance to assist the person in complying
 with this chapter;
 (2)  advise the person of the prohibition under Section
 604A.002; and
 (3)  state that the person may be liable for a civil
 penalty for a subsequent violation of Section 604A.002.
 (b-1)  If the person complies with Section 604A.002 not later
 than the 30th day after the date of the notice under Subsection (b),
 the violation is cured and the person is not liable for the civil
 penalty.  A person who has previously received notice of
 noncompliance under Subsection (b) is not entitled to notice of or
 the opportunity to cure a subsequent violation of Section 604A.002.
 (c)  The attorney general or the prosecuting attorney, as
 appropriate, is entitled to recover reasonable expenses incurred in
 obtaining injunctive relief, civil penalties, or both, under this
 section, including reasonable attorney's fees, court costs, and
 investigatory costs.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a sale of goods or services occurring on or after the effective date
 of this Act.  A sale of goods or services occurring before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the sale occurred, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 641 passed the Senate on
 April 15, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 13, 2015, by the
 following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 641 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 1, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 113,
 Nays 22, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor