E | 05/28/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/28/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3103 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3898 | |
Senate | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1741 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1787 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1680 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3694 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Record vote | RV#1172 | Journal Page: 3693 |
House | 05/18/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3693 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3693 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3511 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3511 | |
House | 05/14/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 3082 | Journal Page: 3511 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2965 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2015 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 2262 | |
House | 04/30/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2262 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1365 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 04/01/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 663 | |
Senate | 03/31/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 550 | |
Senate | 03/17/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 281 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 281 | |
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |