House | 05/11/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 3105 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3105 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2809 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1403 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1403 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1403 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1403 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1402 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1402 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1402 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 West | Journal Page: 1401 |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1401 | |
Senate | 05/04/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/28/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 282 | |
Senate | 02/24/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 282 | |
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |