Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB677 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Creighton S.B. No. 677
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2015; February 24, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 April 23, 2015, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 14, Nays 0; April 23, 2015,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 677 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the savings incentive program for state agencies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 2108.103, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The affected agency retains one-half [one- fourth] of
 the amount of savings verified by the comptroller[, not to exceed
 one percent of the amount of undedicated general revenue derived
 from nonfederal sources appropriated to the agency for the fiscal
 year in which the savings are realized].
 (c)  Of the savings retained by the agency, one-half:
 (1)  must be used to make additional principal payments
 for general obligation bonds issued by the agency or on behalf of
 the agency by the Texas Public Finance Authority; or
 (2)  if there are no outstanding general obligation
 bonds issued by the agency or on behalf of the agency by the Texas
 Public Finance Authority, may be used to provide bonuses,
 distributed equally, to each agency employee who:
 (A)  is a current full-time equivalent employee of
 the agency;
 (B)  worked for the agency as a full-time
 equivalent employee for the entire fiscal year in which the savings
 were realized; and
 (C)  is directly responsible for or worked in a
 department, office, or other division within the agency that is
 responsible for the savings realized.
 (d)  If the amount of agency savings verified under Section
 2108.102, expressed as a percentage of the total amount of
 undedicated general revenue derived from nonfederal sources
 appropriated to the agency for the fiscal year in which the savings
 were realized, is:
 (1)  less than three percent, a bonus described by
 Subsection (c)(2) may not exceed $250;
 (2)  at least three percent but less than five percent,
 a bonus described by Subsection (c)(2) may not exceed $500;
 (3)  at least five percent but less than 10 percent, a
 bonus described by Subsection (c)(2) may not exceed $750; and
 (4)  10 percent or more, a bonus described by
 Subsection (c)(2) may not exceed $1,000.
 (e)  A state agency  shall adopt rules to implement this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies to notice under Section
 2108.101, Government Code, of savings from appropriations to a
 state agency for a state fiscal year beginning on or after September
 1, 2015.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *