E
|
06/20/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/20/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3648
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3644
|
House
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6020
|
Senate
|
05/31/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3603
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5570
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3342
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
Senate adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
SR 988
|
Journal Page: 3340
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2664
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1603
|
Journal Page: 4933
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4933
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 2158
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1861
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1861
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4034
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4034
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 1715
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1713
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1566
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3274
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#987
|
Journal Page: 3274
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3274
|
House
|
05/13/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3274
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3189
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Muoz
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 963
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3266
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2444
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2138
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1303
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1029
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 452
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 284
|
Senate
|
02/24/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 284
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2015
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|