LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB684
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB684
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB684
Compare Versions
SB684 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB684 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB684 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB684 Comm Sub May 12, 2015
SB684 Engrossed April 30, 2015
SB684 Comm Sub April 22, 2015
SB684 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB684 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB684 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
SB684 Enrolled May 30, 2015
SB684 Comm Sub May 12, 2015
SB684 Engrossed April 30, 2015
SB684 Comm Sub April 22, 2015
SB684 Introduced February 23, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare