House | 05/04/2015 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 05/04/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2444 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1942 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1127 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1085 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Amended | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Nichols | Journal Page: 1084 |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/23/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/22/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 952 | |
Senate | 04/14/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/04/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 343 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 94 | |
Senate | 01/26/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 94 | |
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/10/2014 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |