Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB69 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ellis, Seliger S.B. No. 69
 (In the Senate - Filed November 10, 2014; January 26, 2015,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 16, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 1; April 16, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a notification requirement if a public school campus or
 open-enrollment charter school does not have a nurse assigned to
 the campus during all instructional hours.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 38, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 38.020 to read as follows:
 Sec. 38.020.  PARENTAL NOTIFICATION CONCERNING NURSES.
 (a)  In this section, "nurse" means a nurse licensed under Chapter
 301, Occupations Code.
 (b)  A public school, including an open-enrollment charter
 school, that does not have a full-time nurse or the equivalent of a
 full-time nurse assigned to be present on the campus for more than
 30 consecutive instructional days during the same school year shall
 provide written notice of the absence of a nurse to the parent of or
 other person standing in parental relation to each student enrolled
 in the school.
 (c)  A school has the equivalent of a full-time nurse under
 Subsection (b) if the school has two or more nurses assigned to the
 school and those nurses' combined presence covers all regular
 student instructional hours at a campus during the regular school
 day.
 (d)  The principal of the school shall provide the notice
 required by Subsection (b) not later than the 30th instructional
 day after the first day the school does not have a full-time nurse
 assigned to be present on the campus.
 (e)  The school shall:
 (1)  make a good faith effort to ensure that the notice
 required by this section is provided in a bilingual form to any
 parent or other person standing in parental relation whose primary
 language is not English; and
 (2)  retain a copy of any notice provided under this
 section.
 (f)  A school may satisfy the notice requirement under
 Subsection (d) by posting the notice on the school's Internet
 website.  Notice posted under this subsection must be accessible
 from the home page of the Internet website by use of not more than
 three links.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2015-2016
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *