E | 05/28/2015 | Effective on 9/1/15 | ||
E | 05/28/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3103 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 05/20/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3898 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1715 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1723 | |
Senate | 05/18/2015 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1632 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3580 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | RV#1119 | Journal Page: 3580 |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3580 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3580 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3556 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3556 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1687 | Journal Page: 3556 |
House | 05/08/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/05/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/27/2015 | Referred to Land & Resource Management | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 04/27/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2003 | |
House | 03/25/2015 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1029 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 580 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 579 | |
Senate | 03/25/2015 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 614 | |
Senate | 03/24/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 383 | |
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 292 | |
Senate | 02/25/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 292 | |
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2015 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |